LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB139
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB139
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB139
Compare Versions
SB139 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB139 Amended August 26, 2011
SB139 Amended June 23, 2011
SB139 Amended May 24, 2011
SB139 Amended May 10, 2011
SB139 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB139 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB139 Amended August 26, 2011
SB139 Amended June 23, 2011
SB139 Amended May 24, 2011
SB139 Amended May 10, 2011
SB139 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare