LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1390
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1390
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1390
Compare Versions
SB1390 Amended July 3, 2012
SB1390 Amended June 27, 2012
SB1390 Amended June 13, 2012
SB1390 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1390 Amended April 19, 2012
SB1390 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1390 Amended March 28, 2012
SB1390 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1390 Amended July 3, 2012
SB1390 Amended June 27, 2012
SB1390 Amended June 13, 2012
SB1390 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1390 Amended April 19, 2012
SB1390 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1390 Amended March 28, 2012
SB1390 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare