California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1391 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 15, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012