|
07/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4319.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5561.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5527.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3164.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3104.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|