California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1395 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill May 15, 2012
Bill May 8, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012