05/03/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 8. | |||
04/19/2012 | Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. | |||
04/16/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/11/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |