LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB140
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB140
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB140
Compare Versions
SB140 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB140 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB140 Amended August 26, 2011
SB140 Amended August 15, 2011
SB140 Amended July 13, 2011
SB140 Amended June 29, 2011
SB140 Amended May 24, 2011
SB140 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB140 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB140 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB140 Amended August 26, 2011
SB140 Amended August 15, 2011
SB140 Amended July 13, 2011
SB140 Amended June 29, 2011
SB140 Amended May 24, 2011
SB140 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare