|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 3488.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|