California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1408 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill May 10, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012