01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
04/11/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/17/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/16/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 358.) (March 15). | |||
03/04/2011 | Set for hearing March 15. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
02/01/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. | |||
01/31/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |