06/06/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/10/2012 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3404.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3188.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/27/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |