|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5751.)
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3711.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3596.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3307.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|