05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/15/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/14/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 14. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3305.) (April 25). | |||
03/28/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |