01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/03/2011 | Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/12/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/11/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
03/31/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/29/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
03/23/2011 | Set for hearing April 5. | |||
03/21/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
03/14/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/01/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. | |||
01/31/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |