04/23/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3260.) | |||
04/12/2012 | Set for hearing April 23. | |||
04/11/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/30/2012 | Set for hearing April 16. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |