08/29/2012 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Allen. | |||
08/24/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Action rescinded whereby amendment were adopted. | |||
08/20/2012 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/16/2012 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
06/25/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/21/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3666.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/23/2012 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
05/08/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (May 8). | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing May 8. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |