|
08/28/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 3748.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3514.) (May 14).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3307.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|