|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 765, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 6186.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 3647.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3597.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3313.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|