|
07/09/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5422.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3496.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3389.) (May 1).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3143.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|