LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1448
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1448
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1448
Compare Versions
SB1448 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB1448 Enrolled August 23, 2012
SB1448 Amended June 27, 2012
SB1448 Amended June 11, 2012
SB1448 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1448 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1448 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1448 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB1448 Enrolled August 23, 2012
SB1448 Amended June 27, 2012
SB1448 Amended June 11, 2012
SB1448 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1448 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1448 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare