|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 567, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4967.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6351.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3714.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3308.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|