07/13/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/13/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/03/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |||
06/27/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/27/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5482.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/21/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/20/2012 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |||
05/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3404.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 25). | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
04/05/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |