06/27/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
06/20/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3666.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/23/2012 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3458.) (May 9). | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 9. | |||
04/16/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/05/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |