|
08/31/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 6783.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (August 30).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6486.)
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6404.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6258.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3744.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3597.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3262.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3211.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23 in E.Q. pending receipt.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|