LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1456
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1456
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1456
Compare Versions
SB1456 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1456 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1456 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1456 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1456 Amended July 5, 2012
SB1456 Amended June 26, 2012
SB1456 Amended June 11, 2012
SB1456 Amended April 26, 2012
SB1456 Amended March 28, 2012
SB1456 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1456 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1456 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1456 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1456 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1456 Amended July 5, 2012
SB1456 Amended June 26, 2012
SB1456 Amended June 11, 2012
SB1456 Amended April 26, 2012
SB1456 Amended March 28, 2012
SB1456 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare