|
09/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 577, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5080.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6646.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 6647.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 28).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Amendments by Assembly Member Knight tabled on motion by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. (Ayes 38. Noes 30. Page 6269.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 6270.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 3648.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3597.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3231.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|