04/24/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/18/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3189.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/30/2012 | Set for hearing April 16. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |