|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 5008.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 6442.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6250.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6119.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 3696.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3597.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3209.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|