|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 658, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4988.)
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Set for hearing August 29.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4854.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 9. Page 6187.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6052.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3709.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3597.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 3104.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing March 10.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|