|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3694.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3597.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3305.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|