05/05/2011 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
05/02/2011 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 8. Page 847.) | |||
04/27/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. (Vote only.) | |||
04/25/2011 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 8. Page 736.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/08/2011 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/07/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/30/2011 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/29/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
03/22/2011 | Set for hearing April 4. | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
02/02/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. | |||
02/01/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |