04/17/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/11/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |||
03/29/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |