|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 873, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4699.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 6009.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5761.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3291.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3210.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|