California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1480 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill July 5, 2012
Bill June 15, 2012
Bill May 29, 2012
Bill May 2, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012