|
08/28/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 3746.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3597.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3260.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|