07/03/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/21/2012 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |||
05/14/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 3488.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/08/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/07/2012 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 3263.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/12/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |