California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1485 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 20, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012