04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3307.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/16/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/11/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |