|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 838, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4978.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 6356.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 3648.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3598.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3315.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3206.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|