|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6008.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3494.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3447.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. (Corrected April 11.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|