LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1495
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1495
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1495
Compare Versions
SB1495 Chaptered September 25, 2012
SB1495 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1495 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1495 Amended August 14, 2012
SB1495 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1495 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1495 Chaptered September 25, 2012
SB1495 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1495 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1495 Amended August 14, 2012
SB1495 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1495 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare