|
09/26/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4855.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6176.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6051.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3472.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3232.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|