BILL NUMBER: SB 15AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 2, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 19, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senators DeSaulnier and Wolk (Principal coauthor: Senator Rubio) (Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Alejo, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Feuer, and Huffman) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Buchanan and Gordon) DECEMBER 6, 2010 An act to amend Section 13308 of the Government Code, relating to the state budget. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 15, as amended, DeSaulnier. State budget. Existing law requires the Governor to submit to the Legislature, within the first 10 days of each calendar year, a budget for the ensuing fiscal year. Under existing law, the budget is required to contain a complete plan and itemized statements of all proposed expenditures and all estimated revenues of the state for the ensuing fiscal year, together with a comparison with the actual revenues and expenditures for the last completed fiscal year, the estimated revenues and expenditures for the existing fiscal year, and the budgeted revenues and expenditures for the next fiscal year. Existing law further requires the Director of Finance to provide to the Legislature, on or before May 14 of each year, an estimate of General Fund revenues for the current fiscal year and the ensuing fiscal year, any proposals to reduce expenditures to reflect updated revenue estimates, and specified proposed adjustments to the Governor's Budget. This bill would require the Director of Finance to submit, at the time of the submission of the budget by the Governor, itemized statements for recommeded , or as soon thereafter as feasible, total recommended state General Fund expenditures and estimated state revenues, including which include (1) an estimate of total General Fund resources , including any proposed resources, available for state General Fund expenditures for the budget year and the succeeding 4 3 fiscal years following the budget year, as well as revenues anticipated to be one-time revenues , (2) a 5-year capital infrastructure plan, (3) a projection of anticipated state expenditures for the budget year and 4 the succeeding 3 fiscal years following the budget year, as specified , and (4) to the extent possible, estimates and projections from the Governor's Budgets for applicable to the budget year from the previous 4 fiscal years enacted Budget Act projections . The bill would require specified parts of this information to be updated at , as soon as feasible, within specified times. This bill would also require the Director of Finance to seek to contract with the University of California to produce a report due to the director and to the Joint Legislative Budget Committee within the first 10 days of the 2013-14 Legislative Session on the long-term impact of the state budget on the economy of the state, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 13308 of the Government Code is amended to read: 13308. (a) (1) At the time of the submission of the Governor's Budget pursuant to Section 12 of Article IV of the California Constitution, within the first 10 days of each calendar year, or as soon thereafter as feasible, the Director of Finance shall submit to the Legislature itemized statements for total recommended state General Fund expenditures and estimated , including any proposed, state General Fund revenues that shall include the following: (A) An estimate of revenues anticipated to be one-time revenues. (B) (A) The five-year capital infrastructure plan required by Section 13102. (C) (B) An estimate of the total General Fund resources , including any proposed resources, available for the state General Fund expenditures recommended for the budget year and the four three fiscal years following the budget year. (D) (C) A projection of anticipated state General Fund expenditures recommended for the budget year and, for the four three fiscal years following the budget year, the changes in those expenditure amounts that would likely result from changes in population, caseload, and similar factors. (2) To the extent possible, the information total resources and expenditures provided pursuant to subparagraphs (C) (B) and (D) (C) of paragraph (1) shall be accompanied by the estimates and projections applicable to the Governor's Budgets for budget year from the previous four fiscal years enacted Budget Act projections . (3) The information provided pursuant to subparagraphs (C) (B) and (D) (C) of paragraph (1) shall be updated in as soon as feasible after both the submission pursuant to subdivision (e) of this section , and upon enactment of the Budget Act. (b) The Director of Finance shall provide to the Legislature, on or before February 1 of each year, all proposed statutory changes, as prepared by the Legislative Counsel, that are necessary to implement the Governor's Budget, as described in subdivision (a) of Section 13337. (c) The Director of Finance shall provide to the Legislature, on or before April 1 of each year, all proposed adjustments to the Governor's Budget except as specified by subdivisions (d) and (e). (d) The Director of Finance shall provide to the Legislature, on or before May 1 of each year, all proposed adjustments to the Governor's Budget in appropriations for capital outlay. (e) The Director of Finance shall provide to the Legislature, on or before May 14 of each year, all of the following: (1) An estimate of General Fund revenues for the current fiscal year and for the ensuing fiscal year. (2) Any proposals to reduce expenditures to reflect updated revenue estimates. (3) All proposed adjustments to the Governor's Budget that are necessary to reflect updated estimates of state funding required pursuant to Section 8 of Article XVI of the California Constitution, or to reflect caseload enrollment or population changes. (f) The Director of Finance may authorize suspension for the current fiscal year of any provision of this section not sooner than 30 days after notification in writing of the necessity therefor to the chairperson of the committee in each house that considers the State Budget and the Chairperson of the Joint Legislative Budget Committee. SEC. 2. The Director of Finance shall seek to contract with the University of California to produce a report on the long-term impact that the state budget has on the economy of California, due to the Director of Finance and the Joint Legislative Budget Committee within the first 10 days of the 2013-14 Legislative Session. The selection of the entity that shall author the report shall be made in consultation with the chairs of the budget committees in each house of the Legislature.