LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB15
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB15
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB15
Compare Versions
SB15 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB15 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB15 Amended September 2, 2011
SB15 Amended August 25, 2011
SB15 Amended May 19, 2011
SB15 Amended April 25, 2011
SB15 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB15 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB15 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB15 Amended September 2, 2011
SB15 Amended August 25, 2011
SB15 Amended May 19, 2011
SB15 Amended April 25, 2011
SB15 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare