|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 875, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6118.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3637.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3206.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|