07/03/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/27/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3638.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/09/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/08/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3445.) (May 7). | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3307.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/11/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |