06/15/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/15/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/04/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
06/04/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
05/31/2012 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5200.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/17/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/16/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 16). | |||
05/03/2012 | Referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/26/2012 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 3290.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/17/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/16/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3144.) (April 12). | |||
04/10/2012 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |