04/26/2012 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3289.) Set, second hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. | |||
04/25/2012 | Set for hearing April 26 pending suspension of rules. | |||
04/24/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/18/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/16/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3121.) (April 11). | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/28/2012 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and V.A. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |