07/02/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 5. Page 4261.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/28/2012 | Set for hearing July 2. | |||
05/14/2012 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 14. | |||
05/03/2012 | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and RLS. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |