|
05/16/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 1384.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1226.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on APPR.) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 1226.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 806.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 620.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|